Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prince, Tiffany Ella, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Prince, Cameron Bailey, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time175 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.