Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Blakely Gene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis, Tonna Diane, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time44 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Ptnr | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Property Declaration | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.