Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Waldrop, Kimberly A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Waldrop, Jacob K.E., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time115 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Property Declaration | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Returning Documents | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.