Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Green, Natalie Christine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Green, Brandon Lee, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: McBride-Pera, Kim E |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Electronic | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Ptnr | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Electronic | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Ptnr | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Electronic | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Order - No Fee | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Verification of Destruction of Exhibits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.