Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Higgins, Penny, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Higgins, Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kim E. McBride Pera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim E. McBride Pera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time274 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.