Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Waddell, Carey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Waddell, Ninfa, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Wirtschafter, Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWirtschafter, Benjamin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time415 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.