Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perry, Robert Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chavez, Mariahann, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time176 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
FL Notice of Status/Case Mgmt Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.