Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barber, Chris, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barber, Debra, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Wirtschafter, Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWirtschafter, Benjamin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management41 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions260 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time265 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Ptnr |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.