Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Toscas, Krystle L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Toscas, Christopher J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management41 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
November 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.