Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Reginald M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis, Dawna R, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management41 days |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1266 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | FL Status/Case Management Conference | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.