Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Franz, Jeremy M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Franz, Marion L, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management46 days |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial348 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions438 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time438 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Long Cause Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.