Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Orellana, Julie A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Orellana, Angel R, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management47 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions169 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time169 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Default by Court | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration RE Service of Disclosure Respondents I&E | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.