Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Molina, Jacki L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Molina, Richard F, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kathleen R. O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen R. O'Connor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management38 days |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time598 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | FL Status/Case Management Conference | |
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.