Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sliger, Wanda Jane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sliger, Noble Pete, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2224 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | FL Status/Case Management Conference | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.