Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Osbourn Iii, Walter L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Osbourn, Christine I, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kathleen R. O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen R. O'Connor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1302 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.