Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meunier, Jonathan P, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Meunier, Heather A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions30 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration RE Service of Disclosure Respondents I&E | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.