Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Goff, Charles V, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Goff, Charlene A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management119 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application/Order | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Default by Court | |
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration RE Service Dec of Disclosure Petitioners I&E | |
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.