Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rendon, Brandy Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rendon, Jason Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateJune 22, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2757 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion / Petition | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.