Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tulisso, Linda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tulisso, Alessandro, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions199 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time199 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Family Law RFO/Motion/OSC $60 | |
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.