Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boyle, Aaron, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Boyle, Christina, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Conversion Error, . presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion Error, . Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management830 days |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial734 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions53 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time53 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support (Outgoing) | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support (Outgoing) | |
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.