Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jones, Leah, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jones, Brynley, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement | |
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice Transfer Out Case | |
February 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
January 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Mediation Orientation
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.