Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Takhvar, Diana L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Takhvar, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions351 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time351 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Default by Court | |
November 23, 2005 | Docket Event | Declaration RE Service Dec of Disclosure Petitioners I&E | |
November 23, 2005 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
November 23, 2005 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
November 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.