Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Erickson, Ronald, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Erickson, Amy, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2002 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time1105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
May 02, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
May 02, 2005 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order | |
May 20, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 29, 2004 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 29, 2004 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
March 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
December 29, 2003 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.