Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Grill, Catherine Carter, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Pg&E Corporation, Pacific Gas And Electric Company, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
Category(14) Unlimited Eminent Domain/Inv Cond |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.