Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Snyder, Lenora, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Caramanica, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time17 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings and Order to Terminate Restraining Order After Hrg | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Regarding Remote Appearance | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Order - No Fee | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.