Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Currier, Lorraine, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Kecy, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time249 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Receipt for Transferred Case | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Return Receipt | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Transfer | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings and Order to Terminate Restraining Order After Hrg | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.