Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Warner, Kristen, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Humphrey, Brandon J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2017 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing to Renew Restraining Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DV Order to Renew Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Renew Restraining Order | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DV Notice of Hearing To Renew Restraining Order | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing with Children | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.