Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tapia, Marisol, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Tapia, Emanuel, represented by Brown, David, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Wirtschafter, Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWirtschafter, Benjamin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2017 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time343 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Supervised Visitation Referral | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.