Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Milhous, Sommer, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Wheeler, Kelsi L, against Canales, Elijah Erick, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2012 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions80 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time2378 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Long Cause Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Order - No Fee | |
December 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Verification of Destruction of Exhibits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.