Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson, Berlinda Lynn, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Wilson, Gregory Marvin, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2010 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time33 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial - Long Cause
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
August 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.