Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Welch, Michelle, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Welch, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2010 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time14 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Mediation Orientation
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets Information | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.