Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Donovan, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Waters, Josiah, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Conversion Error, . presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion Error, . Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions14 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time14 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Judge, Visiting |
|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mediation Calendar
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | FL Mediation Calendar | |
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mediation Orientation
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.