Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Abrams, Jessica Alexandra, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Ralston, Susan J, against Garcia, Joel Craig, represented by Van Den Heuvel, Mark R, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Conversion Error, . presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion Error, . Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2008 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial - Long Cause
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Judge, Visiting |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.