Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Delisle, Denise, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Fountain, James Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Judge, Visiting presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Visiting Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2008 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions37 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | FL Order Re: FTA At Orientation/Mediation To Judge | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mediation Calendar
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Mediation Calendar
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.