Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Torres, Nancy, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Magana, Pedro, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions130 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time938 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
July 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required (conversion) | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.