Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez Jr, Vicente Octavio, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Velasquez, Nancy, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time98 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Consolidated | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Review Hearing Family Law | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Mediation Calendar
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Mediation Orientation
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.