Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Peo Of The St Of Ca, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 1997 |
Category(39) Unlimited Other Judicial Review |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Historical Case - Ignore JBSIS Errors | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice to Dismiss on Court's Motion 5-Year | |
April 14, 2003 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Mathews, Thomas F |
|
February 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
February 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
February 24, 2003 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 30, 2003 | Docket Event | Notice to Dismiss on Court's Motion 5-Year | |
April 18, 2000 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
April 18, 2000 | Docket Event | Unspecified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.