Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of San Pedro, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Belzer, Steven P, against Lawson, James R., Lawson, Lois A., Schuette, Debora, Schuette, Frank, The Hamaker Family Trust, (total of 7) See All represented by Sanders, Charles W, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Historical Case - Ignore JBSIS Errors | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion / Petition | |
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended Notice | |
September 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion / Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.