Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Worden, Pamela, Worden, Steven, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dillavou, Nicolas M., against Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., represented by Sutton & Murphy, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Cvcv) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Posted | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Posted | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.