Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Aloha, Wendy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Peiffer, Carroll Edward, against Fortna, William, Polaris Industries, Inc., U.S. Battery Mfg. Augusta, Inc., represented by Costa, Daniel P, Matheny Sears Linkert & Long Llp, The Ryan Law Group, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedMay 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Ruling on Submitted Matter | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Under Submission for Decision | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply Filed | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.