Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Doe, A.J., Doe, J., Doe, M.D., Doe, S., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Santana, Jesse I, against Babcock, William Wayne, Chiechi, June, Marysville Joint Unified School District, represented by Garcia, Lynn A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
Category(35) Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Brief Filed | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Appeal - Respondent's Reply Brief Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.