Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Parker, Jason, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Carlos, Christopher, against County Of Sutter, Hopper, Amanda, Jordan, Jean, Romeo, Regina, represented by Maddox, Jesse J., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateJune 16, 2020 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Ruling on Submitted Matter | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.