Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miles, Karen, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Clingo Law Group, against Fremont-Rideout Management Serivces Organization, Rideout Memorial Hospital, Fremont-Rideout Health Group, represented by Owensby, Jeffery, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time362 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Posted | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.