Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Breceda, Brenda, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Jt Legal Group Apc, against Bank Of America Na, Green Tree Servicing Llc, Quality Loan Service Corporation, represented by Mccarthy & Holthus Llp, Severson & Werson, Wolfe & Wyman Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kim E. McBride Pera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim E. McBride Pera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonopposition | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion - $60 Fee | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.