Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nordic Industries Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Porter & Scott, against Lennar Homes Of Ca, U S Home Corporation, represented by Kendrick Jackson &Kearl, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Michael A. Jacques presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A. Jacques Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2010 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time439 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
November 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.