Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jpmorgan Chase Legal Dept, against Mello, Alice E, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateJune 17, 2010 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.