Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valley View Packing Co Inc, Valley View Packing Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Reclamation District No 784, Sacramento & San Joaquin Drainage District, State Of California Dept Of Water Resource, represented by Attorney General, Lindmark, Carl R., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time600 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.