Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Howard, David, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Kuhner, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SC Request to Postpone Trial | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.