Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marysville Group Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Thompson, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Make Payments | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Make Payments | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SC Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Ruling on Submitted Matter | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Under Submission for Decision | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.