Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Monigatti - Lake, Sophie, Monigatti-Lake, Neva Marie, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against River Highlands Ranch And Vineyard, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Small Claims Order on Request to Postpone Trial | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Documents Received From | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Small Claims Request to Postpone Trial | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.